Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Morales, Clippinger, Hayes, Korman, A. Miller, Platt, Reznik, Rosenberg, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Favorable Report Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain mental health or child care practitioners from engaging in conversion therapy with individuals who are minors; providing that a certain mental health or child care practitioner who engages in conversion therapy with a minor shall be considered to have engaged in unprofessional conduct subject to disciplinary action; defining "conversion therapy" as a practice or treatment by a mental health or child care practitioner that seeks to change an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1028
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Conversion Therapy for Minors - Prohibition (Youth Mental Health Protection Act)
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Delegate Cullison) Adopted 59
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM