Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Truancy Education Pilot Program - Parents and Guardians of Students
Sponsored by
Delegates Boteler, Cluster, Aumann, Bromwell, Frank, Glass, Kach, Minnick, Szeliga, and Weir
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified court in Baltimore County to include mandatory participation in a Truancy Education Pilot Program as a condition under which the court may suspend a specified fine or prison sentence of a person who fails to see that a child attends school, subject to a specified limitation; requiring the Office of Pupil Personnel Services in Baltimore County to implement a Truancy Education Pilot Program for a specified number of the parents or guardians of students who are chronically truant; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM