Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Gun–Free Higher Education Zones
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Frush, Gilchrist, Jackson, Korman, Lafferty, McIntosh, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Robinson, Sanchez, Tarlau, Valderrama, and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain exception relating to law enforcement officers to the prohibition on carrying certain weapons on public school property; requiring a public institution of higher education to post certain signs in prominent locations on the property; requiring the Secretary of State Police to issue a letter to a certain applicant affirming that a permit has been issued; requiring the Board of Regents for the University System of Maryland to incorporate into its bylaws, policies, and procedures the current weapons practice; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0159 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984469/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {453522/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {663721/2 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (53-77)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {453820/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (51-84)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {253626/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (50-84)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Gun–Free Higher Education Zones
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (89-49)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Weapon-Free Higher Education Zones
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable with Amendments {984469/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Rey) Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {453522/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {663721/2 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (53-77) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {453820/1 (Delegate Rose) Rejected (51-84) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {253626/1 (Delegate Afzali) Rejected (50-84) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Gun–Free Higher Education Zones
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (89-49) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Referred Rules 62
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-102 )
(   15-123 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM