Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Carr, Lehman, and Love
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a summary of each nutrient management plan be filed and updated with the Department of Agriculture at certain times; authorizing the Department to require an updated summary to take the form of an annual implementation report; requiring a manure broker to provide certain information to a certain person; requiring a person who holds a certain certificate or license to comply with certain reporting requirements and deadlines related to implementation of the Phosphorus Management Tool; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0546
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {710518/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Stein) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {710518/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-43)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {710518/1 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Stein) Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {710518/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-43) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-801.1, 8-803, 8-803.1, 8-807 )
(   9-301, 9-323, 9-325 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM