Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Bay - Nutrient Management - Poultry Fair Share Act
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Robinson, Bobo, Carr, Gutierrez, Hubbard, Hucker, A. Kelly, Lee, A. Miller, Mizeur, Pena-Melnyk, Simmons, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing a specified chicken manure pollution fee payable to the Comptroller by a specified poultry integrator in a specified manner; requiring the Comptroller to transfer revenue from the fee to the Maryland Agriculture Water Quality Cost Share Program in the Department of Agriculture for specified cover crop activities; repealing specified provisions of law requiring the Comptroller to disburse specified funds from the Bay Restoration Fund to be used for specified cover crop activities; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0725
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/17/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/14/2014 2/17/2014 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-704.3 )
(   9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM