Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and Processes
Sponsored by
Delegates Miele, Cassilly, Impallaria, Krebs, McComas, Metzgar, Shoemaker, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending specified provisions of and adding a new article to the Maryland Constitution for the purpose of changing the legislative and congressional districting standards and processes; requiring that each Senate legislative district be subdivided into a specified number of House legislative districts, each of which must contain a specified number of Delegates; establishing the Nonpartisan Districting Commission; requiring that specified plans become law on adoption by the Commission; etc.
Committees
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM