Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Purchasing Products Containing Chicken Processed in China - Prohibition on Use of State Funds
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Simmons, Stocksdale, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of State funds to purchase a product that contains chicken that was processed in China; and applying the prohibition to specified procurements and units of State government that are generally excluded from State procurement law.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page