Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Arentz, Beitzel, Bromwell, Carey, Dumais, Kelly, Kipke, Kittleman, Kramer, Krebs, Krimm, Lam, R. Lewis, McComas, Morgan, Morhaim, Reznik, Shoemaker, Szeliga, West, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a system for adjudication of a claim involving a birth-related neurological injury; providing for certain benefits and compensation, of a claimant under the Act; establishing the Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund to provide compensation and benefits to eligible claimants; providing for certain premiums and insurance surcharges to be used to finance and administer the Fund; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0862
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1347 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Text - First - Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 2/09/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2D-01 through 3-2D-08 )
(   20-1901 through 20-1903 )
(   33-101 through 33-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM