Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 116-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission to establish a Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program for replacement of specified pipes on specified property; requiring the Program to provide for specified eligibility requirements; requiring that the replacement of specified pipes be performed by a licensed plumber; requiring the Program to require specified customers to repay the loan through a charge on the customer's water and sewer bill; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {190916/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {287872/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Delegates Healey, S. Robinson, and Cassilly
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Senators Feldman, Kelley, and Reilly
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Favorable with Amendments {190916/1 Report Adopted 51
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/24/2015 3/22/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 52
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Finance 49
Senate 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {287872/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Requests Senate Recede 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Delegates Healey, S. Robinson, and Cassilly 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Senate Refuses to Recede 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Senators Feldman, Kelley, and Reilly 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM