Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Kaiser, D. Barnes, Buckel, Ebersole, C. Howard, Mosby, Patterson, Reilly, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Walker, M. Washington, A. Washington, Wilkins, S. Howard, and Glass
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain county boards of education, beginning with the 2019-2020 school year, to ensure that a certain student is screened to identify if the student is at risk for reading difficulties; authorizing a county board to use a screening instrument that includes a normed rapid automatized naming assessment for certain students; requiring a county board to monitor a student who receives structured literacy reading instruction for an appropriate time period; requiring a county board to provide certain progress reports; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0548
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {525861/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344539/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Rose and Patterson)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Rose and Patterson)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Zucker and Bates)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Zucker and Bates)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Conference Committee Report {283321/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {525861/1 Adopted 46
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Education - Students With Reading Difficulties - Screenings and Interventions
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 47
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {344539/1 Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 63
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Rose and Patterson) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Luedtke, Rose and Patterson) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Zucker and Bates) 66
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Refuses Recede 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Zucker and Bates) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Conference Committee Report {283321/1 Adopted 69
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 69
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-134 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM