Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy
Sponsored by
Delegates Smigiel, Carr, Rosenberg, and Waldstreicher
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the application of a provision of law that requires an investigative or law enforcement officer to obtain a specified search warrant in order to require a provider of wire or electronic communication service to disclose the contents of wire or electronic communication that is in electronic storage in a wire or electronic communications system for 180 days or less to a wire or electronic communication that is in electronic storage for any amount of time.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0924
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {532015/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {532015/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM