Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Child Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Acevero, D. Barnes, Barve, Boyce, Bridges, Cardin, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, Ebersole, Feldmark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Ivey, Kelly, Korman, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Qi, Queen, Ruth, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Stewart, Washington, Wells, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain taxpayers with federal adjusted gross income for the taxable year that is $6,000 or less to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain dependent children under certain circumstances; providing that the credit is equal to $500 for each qualified child; allowing certain taxpayers to claim a refund in the amount of any excess credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019, but before January 1, 2025; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0638
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Child Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Child Tax Credit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 10:58 AM