Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority – Video Tolls – Collection
Sponsored by
Delegate Lisanti
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending, from May 31, 2021, to May 31, 2024, the termination date for certain provisions of law relating to the authority of the Central Collection Unit to collect certain unpaid video tolls and associated penalties that are recalled by the Maryland Transportation Authority.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority – Video Tolls – Collection
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/04/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Transportation Authority – Video Tolls – Collection
House 2/04/2021 2/04/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:17 PM
Click to return on the top page