Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Income Tax Disparity Grants - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Serafini
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of State distributions made to specified counties and Baltimore City based on per capita yield of county income taxes; providing for the effective dates of specified provisions of the Act; and providing for the termination of specified provisions of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013, July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124565/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {124565/2 Report Adopted 53A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM