Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advance Directive Registry - Fee and Date of Operation
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora and Cullison
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to set a fee, by regulation, for specified services of the Advance Directive Registry; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to take the steps necessary to make the Registry operational on or before October 1, 2014.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0790
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-620, 5-622 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM