Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - Holidays
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Carozza, Cassilly, Hornberger, S. Howard, Malone, Mautz, Otto, Reilly, Arentz, Metzgar, and Sample-Hughes
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to adopt specified regulations restricting a tidal fish licensee who catches crabs using trotline gear to a workday of at least 10 hours per day, excluding time spent setting or taking up gear, on specified holidays if the Department authorizes the workday to begin at a specified time.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0837
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {160010/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {254432/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Delegates O'Donnell, Stein, and Gilchrist
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senators Waugh, Zucker, and Bates
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2016 2/26/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {160010/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48A
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {254432/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Delegates O'Donnell, Stein, and Gilchrist 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senators Waugh, Zucker, and Bates 63
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM