Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Wilson, Adams, Afzali, Arentz, Beitzel, Buckel, Carozza, Cassilly, McKay, Metzgar, W. Miller, Reilly, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county to establish, by local law, a specified contracting authority for the purpose of designating a community revitalization and improvement zone for construction of specified facilities; establishing an application process within the Department of Business and Economic Development for designating a zone; authorizing a county to issue specified bonds for the benefit of specified zones; requiring the transfer, from the General Fund, of specified increased tax revenue; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-601 through 12-612 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM