Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Individuals Not Subject to the County Income Tax - Rate
Sponsored by
Delegates Feldmark, Hettleman, Kaiser, Moon, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, from the lowest county income tax rate to 3.0% of Maryland taxable income, the income tax rate imposed on the income of certain individuals who are not subject to a county income tax; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Individuals Not Subject to the County Income Tax - Rate
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Individuals Not Subject to the County Income Tax - Rate
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 10:34 AM