Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Youth Camps - Definitions
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith and Hubbard
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "day camp" to include specified youth camps that have campers who reside at the camp for a specified number of days; altering the definition of "residential camp" for purposes of specified provisions of law governing youth camps to increase the number of days a youth camp may operate as a residential camp; and altering the definitions of "travel camp" and "trip camp" to increase the number of days a residential camp may operate as a travel camp or a trip camp.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0437
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM