Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Motorcycle Profiling - Training
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Anderton, Beidle, Bromwell, Carey, Cassilly, Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glass, Grammer, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jacobs, Lafferty, Mautz, O'Donnell, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Szeliga, and B. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Police Training Commission to require a specified statement condemning motorcycle profiling to be included in existing written policies regarding other profiling; requiring the Commission to include in specified curriculum and courses of study training on motorcycle profiling in conjunction with existing training regarding other profiling; and defining the term "motorcycle profiling".
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0727
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-201, 3-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM