Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Sponsored by
Delegates Miele, Afzali, Anderson, Aumann, B. Barnes, McComas, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission, in consultation with the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention, to develop a standardized format that certain law enforcement agencies shall use in reporting certain data relating to the activation and deployment of certain SWAT teams to the Office and certain local officials; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to provide and publish a certain report; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0705
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - Reports
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM