Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmaceutical Manufacturers - Transparency and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegates Kipke, Adams, Anderton, Cassilly, Corderman, Jalisi, Johnson, Jones, Malone, McComas, Morgan, Reilly, Rose, Saab, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health, by a certain date each year, to identify a certain number of certain prescription drugs on which the State spends a certain amount of money; requiring the Secretary to require a certain pharmaceutical manufacturer to report certain cost changes and expenditures during a certain period of time; requiring the Secretary, by a certain date each year, to publish a report on the Maryland Department of Health's website based on the information the Secretary receives under certain provisions of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0819
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Pharmaceutical Manufacturers - Transparency and Reporting
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   2-1001, 2-1002 )
(   15-144, 15-145, 15-1601, 15-1612.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page