Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Feral Cats - Rabies Vaccinations
Sponsored by
Delegate Kach
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a feral cat caregiver shall make every reasonable effort to ensure that specified feral cats are vaccinated for rabies, ear-tipped, and there is written record made of a specified vaccination; providing that an ear-tipped cat is deemed to have had a rabies vaccination; and defining terms.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-318.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM