Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Barkley, Barve, Carr, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Waldstreicher, Zucker, Beidle, Haynes, Sophocleus, Lafferty, Walker, Turner, Jones, and Gaines
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Capital Grant Program for Local School Systems With Significant Enrollment Growth or Relocatable Classrooms; requiring the Interagency Committee on Public School Construction to implement and administer the Program; specifying requirements for grants awarded under the Program; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2016, to provide $20,000,000 in the State budget for the Program each fiscal year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0490
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164868/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Jones) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-22)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator DeGrange) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Favorable with Amendments {164868/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/30/2015 3/26/2015 Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Jones) Adopted 56
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (116-22) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator DeGrange) Adopted 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Referred Budget and Taxation 56
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM