Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Medical Care - Administration of Opioid Antidotes - Immunity
Sponsored by
Delegates Folden, Atterbeary, Bromwell, Krimm, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying certain immunity from civil liability for certain acts or omissions to certain persons who administer to individuals who appear to be experiencing an opioid overdose a certain dose or certain doses of a certain opioid antidote.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1222
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Emergency Medical Care - Administration of Opioid Antidotes - Immunity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Reassigned to Health and Government Operations Judiciary
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Emergency Medical Care - Administration of Opioid Antidotes - Immunity
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Reassigned to Health and Government Operations Judiciary 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page