Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Dually Enrolled Students - Tuition Waiver
Sponsored by
Delegates Gutierrez, Barkley, Carr, Carter, Cullison, Dumais, Hucker, Ivey, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lee, Luedtke, A. Miller, Reznik, S. Robinson, Waldstreicher, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting specified dually enrolled students from payment of tuition to attend community college under specified circumstances; authorizing a community college to establish guidelines concerning the type of dual enrollment courses that will qualify for the tuition waiver; providing that a community college is not prohibited from waiving tuition for specified other dually enrolled students; defining terms; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM