Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Competitive Retail Electricity and Gas Supply - Consumer Protection - Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Rudolph and James
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to report to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2015, on the status of the Commission's efforts to provide appropriate protections for consumers in connection with competitive retail electricity and retail gas supplies and recommendations for ratepayer protections; specifying the contents of the report; requiring the Commission to convene a specified workgroup to advise the Commission on the information and recommendations that should be included in the report; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1044
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163193/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments {163193/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Finance 41
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM