Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates Malone, McMillan, Beidle, Cane, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Healey, Holmes, Lafferty, McIntosh, Niemann, S. Robinson, Stein, Weir, Wilson, and Conaway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the standards and requirements for the required warning period for violations recorded by speed monitoring systems; altering the standards for signage required for local stationary speed monitoring systems; requiring local jurisdictions to designate specified persons to act in a public liaison capacity; requiring the Maryland Police Training Commission to compile and make publicly available an annual report containing specified information on each local speed monitoring system program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0652
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {180318/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {833120/1 Rejected (48-86)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Schuh) {663824/1 Rejected (46-87)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Ready) {783726/1 Rejected (45-90)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Schulz) {893928/1 Rejected (38-88)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Conaway) {513825/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-20)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {808372/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Delegates Malone, McMillan, and Stein
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Motion Recede (Senator Frosh) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Committee Amendment {808372/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {180318/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) {833120/1 Rejected (48-86) 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Schuh) {663824/1 Rejected (46-87) 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Ready) {783726/1 Rejected (45-90) 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Schulz) {893928/1 Rejected (38-88) 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Conaway) {513825/1 Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (115-20) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 44
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {808372/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Conference Committee Appointed 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Delegates Malone, McMillan, and Stein 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Motion Recede (Senator Frosh) Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Committee Amendment {808372/1 Withdrawn 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Senate Recede 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 491
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM