Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "gross income" for purposes of determining eligibility for and the computation of the homeowners' property tax credit; and applying the Act to tax credits for taxable years beginning after June 30, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0790 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Definition of Gross Income
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM