Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a municipality and specified counties, with regard to short-term, high-intensity or high-usage travel by heavy-weight vehicles, to provide for the designation of local roads on which a heavy-weight vehicle is prohibited unless the hauler has satisfied specified local government requirements for the travel; and authorizing a municipality and specified counties to require a specified hauler to satisfy any specified local government requirements before conducting specified travel on local roads.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0640
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   12-527, 5-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page