Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegates Carr, Kelly, Luedtke, Moon, Morales, S. Robinson, and Smith
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a local licensing board to issue a Class A (off-sale) beer license, wine license, or beer and wine license for use in conjunction with or on the premises of specified warehouse shopping clubs; prohibiting a license holder from operating a gasoline service station or allowing a gasoline service station to be operated on specified premises; establishing that a license holder may sell beer or wine only by the case; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM