Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes, Glenn, Jackson, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting recent high school graduates from payment of tuition to attend a community college in the State under specified circumstances; providing a 50% discount on tuition to individuals who do not have a high school diploma or GED and have been unemployed for at least 6 months but who have been seeking employment and who are attending a community college and seeking vocational certificates or associate's degrees; requiring the State to reimburse community colleges for foregone tuition revenue; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0018 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2017
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM