Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Financial Literacy Curriculum - Graduation Requirements PG 421-15
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Prince George's County Board of Education to develop curriculum content for a course in financial literacy as a part of the county board's high school curriculum; requiring the county board to implement specified curriculum content in high schools in Prince George's County beginning in the 2016-2017 school year; requiring specified students to complete a specified course in order to graduate from high school in Prince George's County beginning in the 2017-2018 school year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0645
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1009 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM