Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-Washington Regional District - Fairness in Zoning MC/PG 112-15
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that, in Prince George's County, the zoning hearing examiner shall issue a decision on a zoning matter not more than 30 days after the matter is remanded and relevant information is received from the applicant or the district council; altering the circumstances under which a specified person or entity aggrieved by a specified decision of the district council may request judicial review of any final decision of the district council; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0564
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {750218/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {304038/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendment
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Favorable with Amendments {750218/1 Report Adopted 51
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/24/2015 3/22/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 52
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Senate 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Favorable with Amendments {304038/1 Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 4/07/2015 3/31/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) 58
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendment 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-206, 22-407, 23-401, 25-212, 25-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM