Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Home Energy Programs, in coordination with the United Way of Central Maryland and the Fuel Fund of Maryland, to establish the Power to the People Pilot Program on or before July 1, 2021, to expand access to the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the Pilot Program to provide training for certain individuals to serve as navigators under the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the United Way of Central Maryland to develop a certain screening intake process; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1024
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423494/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {157879/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed 45-0
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {423494/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 49
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Referred Finance 50
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {157879/1 Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed 45-0 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:23 AM