Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sustainable Communities Tax Credit - Alteration and Extension
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker (By Request - Tax Credit Evaluation Committee)
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "qualified rehabilitation expenditure", for purposes of the sustainable communities tax credit, to exclude any amounts funded by federal grants; repealing the requirement that the competitive award process for the award of initial credit certificates favor underrepresented jurisdictions; extending the termination of the sustainable communities tax credit from July 1, 2017, to July 1, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0759
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM