Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
Sponsored by
Delegates Cassilly, Cardin, Boyce, Clark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Holmes, Jacobs, Jalisi, Lehman, and Otto
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing certain classes of electric bicycles; establishing that electric bicycles may be operated in any place where bicycles are allowed to travel, subject to certain restrictions; prohibiting a person under the age of 16 years from operating a Class 3 electric bicycle on a public highway; requiring manufacturers of electric bicycles to apply a certain label in a certain manner to each electric bicycle beginning January 1, 2020; requiring electric bicycles to comply with federal regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0935
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {410418/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {410418/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycles - Equipment and Operation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-117.1, 11-140.1, 21-1205.2, 22-420 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM