Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - School Vehicles Used by Private Entities - Seat Belt Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegates Haynes and Morhaim
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that school vehicles used by a private, nongovernmental entity to transport specified pupils be equipped with seat belts; prohibiting a person from operating a school vehicle for a private, nongovernmental entity to transport pupils, as specified, unless the person and each occupant under 16 years old is restrained by a seat belt; providing for the application of specified requirements of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0987
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Education - School Vehicles Used by Private Entities - Seat Belt Requirement
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-153, 11-154, 11-173, 11-174, 16-113, 22-412, 22-412.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM