Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Behavioral Health System - Implementation Plans to Improve Efficiency, Accountability, and Outcomes - Workgroup
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to convene a stakeholder workgroup to develop certain implementation plans to improve efficiency, accountability, and outcomes of certain specialty behavioral health services; requiring the workgroup to include certain representatives; requiring that certain implementation plans include certain recommendations for a certain timeline and certain necessary steps to achieve certain outcomes; requiring the Secretary of Health to submit certain reports on or before certain dates; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0976
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Behavioral Health System - Implementation Plans to Improve Efficiency, Accountability, and Outcomes - Workgroup
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM