Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - Credit
Sponsored by
Delegate Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a credit for an employer or insurer for compensation paid to a covered employee who is temporarily totally disabled due to an accidental personal injury or an occupational disease under specified circumstances and during a specified period; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0257
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0654 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-618, 9-621 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM