Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsored by
Delegates Ciliberti, Cox, Krebs, McComas, Metzgar, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a court to prohibit a person convicted of a third or subsequent offense of driving under the influence of alcohol from operating a motor vehicle that is not equipped with an ignition interlock system and to order the person to install an ignition interlock system on the person's vehicle as a sentence, part of a sentence, or condition of probation; requiring a court to order certain motor vehicles to be impounded or immobilized for a certain period under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1391 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   16-404.1, 21-902.4, 21-902.5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page