Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Professional Counselors and Therapists - Misconduct (Lynette's Law)
Sponsored by
Delegates Vogt, Adams, Arentz, Buckel, Carozza, Carter, Cluster, Folden, Ghrist, Glass, Hornberger, Jacobs, Jalisi, Krebs, Malone, McComas, McConkey, McKay, Metzgar, Moon, Rey, Shoemaker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a specified professional counselor or therapist from engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a person who is receiving counseling from the professional counselor or therapist or has received counseling from the professional counselor or therapist within the 2 years preceding the sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0908 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-307, 9-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM