Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young and Guyton
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from $7,500 to $10,000, the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred by an individual that are attributable to the individual's donation of an organ; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0651
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 8:13 AM