Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Children's Cabinet in the Governor's Office for Children - Study on Health and Social Services Needs of Juveniles
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Cullison, Howard, Hubbard, Kach, A. Kelly, and Mitchell
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Children's Cabinet in the Governor's Office for Children to review, compile, and report on specified information regarding efforts or programs related to mental, emotional, and behavioral disorders in juveniles; requiring the Children's Cabinet to make recommendations on the development of a specified combined care management model and the development of a specified screening tool; and requiring the Children's Cabinet to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Reassigned to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Reassigned to Health and Government Operations 25
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM