Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Long–Term Care Insurance – Premium Rate Increases – Restriction (Equity in Long–Term Care Insurance Premiums Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, Gutierrez, Jackson, R. Lewis, McDonough, Stein, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a carrier from imposing a premium rate increase for a policy or contract of long-term care insurance in a year in which the carrier, or any entity with which the carrier is affiliated, pays a dividend, or comparable payment, to its shareholders or a certain bonus or certain benefit to certain executive officers; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Long–Term Care Insurance – Premium Rate Increases – Restriction (Equity in Long–Term Care Insurance Premiums Act)
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM