Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams, Long, and McComas
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a record owner of a certain new dwelling to claim a credit against the State income tax in an amount equal to $1.25 for each square foot of the new dwelling if a certain automatic fire sprinkler system is installed in the new dwelling; requiring the State Fire Marshal to approve applications for the credit in a certain manner; limiting the total amount of credits that may be approved to $1,000,000 in any taxable year; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1143 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM