Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing and establishing requirements for the use of specified vehicle presence monitoring systems in local jurisdictions to enforce State and local laws restricting the presence of vehicles during specified times; establishing that a vehicle presence monitoring system may be used in a local jurisdiction under the Act only if its use is authorized by a local law adopted by the local jurisdiction; requiring the issuance of a warning for a first violation under the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Vehicle Presence Monitoring Systems - Authorization by Local Jurisdictions
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-311, 4-401, 7-301, 7-302 )
(   11-215, 11-318 )
(   21-1130, 26-401 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM