Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Female Inmate Serving Life Term - Transitional Work Release Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Bartlett and Shetty
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Division of Correction within the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to establish a certain transitional work release program for qualified inmates and to adopt certain regulations; establishing the qualifications for participation in a certain transitional work release program; authorizing the Division to conduct certain drug tests, require certain monitoring by a global positioning system device, and to deduct certain wages from a certain program participant for certain purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Female Inmate Serving Life Term - Transitional Work Release Program
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM