Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Lam, Carr, Cullison, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gutierrez, Healey, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, Kelly, Lafferty, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Smith, Stein, Tarlau, C. Wilson, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an applicant for a specified permit for the hydraulic fracturing of a well for the exploration or production of natural gas to submit specified information to the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene in a specified manner; establishing the Hydraulic Fracturing Chemical Education and Impact Fund for specified purposes; requiring the Department to establish a specified fee by regulation; establishing a specified civil penalty for specified violations; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1030 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Reassigned to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Reassigned to Environment and Transportation 24
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-701 through 22-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM