Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pipeline Safety and Community Protection Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Morhaim, Cardin, and Stein
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to act under a specified certification or agreement with the U.S. Secretary of Transportation as an interstate authority agent for the purpose of implementing specified federal pipeline safety laws; requiring a gas transmission company to respond to a report of specified gas leaks in a specified manner; prohibiting a person from beginning construction in the State on a gas pipeline without first obtaining a specified construction permit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0907
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101 through 15-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM